+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Becker and Charbonneau
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Bacon) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Olthoff added as coauthor
- Representative Brown, C. added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Authored by Representative Bacon