+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 119
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 286: yeas 48 and nays 0
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor.
- Senator Buck added second sponsor.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Insurance
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Senator Walker added as sponsor.
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 92 and nays 0
- Referred to the Senate
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Hale), prevailed.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Representative Hale added as coauthor.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Insurance
- Authored by Representative Mayfield
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor