+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 25
- Signed by the Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 48, nays 0
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Tomes added as second sponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Becker
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 87, nays 0
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Coauthored by Representatives Hatfield, Sullivan and Hostettler
- Authored by Representative McNamara