+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 160
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 565: yeas 96, nays 0
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Walker, Tallian and Crider
- Senate conferee appointed: Boots and Arnold
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Mayfield and Moseley
- House conferees appointed: McMillin and Niezgodski
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as third sponsor
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 419: yeas 45 and nays 4
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 1 (Boots), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Boots and Arnold
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 240: yeas 94, nays 1
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Niezgodski added as coauthor
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Cherry added as coauthor
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
- Authored by Representative McMillin