+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 150
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 38, nays 12
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Perfect added as cosponsor
- Amendment #1 (Stoops) failed; Roll Call 184: yeas 9, nays 38
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Houchin removed as sponsor
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
- Senator Houchin added as third sponsor
- Senator Steele added as sponsor
- Senator Ford added as cosponsor
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Houchin and Becker
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 61, nays 32
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Lucas added as coauthor
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Authored by Representative Bacon
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor