+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 118
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 220: yeas 47 and nays 0
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
- Senator Yoder added as sponsor.
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 173: yeas 93 and nays 0
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Natural Resources
- Authored by Representative Messmer
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor