+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 23
- Signed by the Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 46, nays 0
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Young M and Tallian
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 95, nays 0
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Authored by Representative Thompson