+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Law 245
- Signed by the Governor
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Bauer removed as conferee
- Representative Frizzell removed as advisor
- Representative Frizzell added as conferee
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 548: yeas 69, nays 30
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 537: yeas 28, nays 22
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Freeman added as advisor
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Washburne, Frizzell, Bartlett, DeLaney and Pryor
- House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Bauer
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Bray, Breaux, Young M and Delph
- Senate conferees appointed: Merritt and Taylor G
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 367: yeas 33, nays 15
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt, Bray and Ruckelshaus
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 68, nays 29
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (Pryor) failed; Roll Call 42: yeas 30, nays 61
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Coauthored by Representatives Bosma, Frizzell and DeLaney
- Authored by Representative Steuerwald