+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Law 116
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 280: yeas 48 and nays 0
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Broden added as cosponsor.
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
- Senator Charbonneau added as sponsor.
- Representative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor.
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 93 and nays 3
- Representative Morris added as coauthor.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass amend, adopted.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Culver added as coauthor.
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
- Authored by Representative Braun