+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Public Law 193
- Signed by the Governor
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 225: yeas 99, nays 0
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Buck added as third sponsor
- Senator Arnold added as cosponsor
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Boots and Brown L
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 13: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Niezgodski) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Niezgodski added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
- Authored by Representative Carbaugh
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor