+ − Summary
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Public Law 170
- Signed by the Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 444: yeas 81, nays 0
- Motion to concur filed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Yoder added as cosponsor
- Senators Rogers, Koch, Kruse, Sandlin, Holdman added as cosponsors
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 350: yeas 49, nays 0
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Walker G added as cosponsor
- Senator Crane added as third sponsor
- Senator Ford Jon added as second sponsor
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Houchin
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 95, nays 0
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Representatives Gutwein, Olthoff, Andrade M added as coauthors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
- Authored by Representative Frye R