+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to committee on
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Senator Mishler added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Porter) failed;
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Ober added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Cook added as coauthor
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McNamara
- First Reading: referred to Committee on