+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 47
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 494: yeas 97 and nays 0
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 449: yeas 46 and nays 2
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Representative V. Smith added as conferee
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
- Representative Behning added as advisor
- Representative Huston added as advisor
- Representative Errington added as advisor
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Yoder added as conferee
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Representative DeVon added as conferee
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as advisor
- Senator Randolph added as advisor
- Senator Bray added as advisor
- Senator Tallian added as conferee
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added second sponsor.
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 237: yeas 47 and nays 0
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Appropriations
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Senator Yoder added as sponsor.
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 122: yeas 92 and nays 0
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- HB 1028 Amendment #1 (Pelath) motion withdrawn.
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass amend, adopted.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Behning added as coauthor.
- Representative Beumer added as coauthor.
- Representative Moed added as coauthor.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: do pass amend, adopted.
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Education
- Authored by Representative DeVon
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor