+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 111
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 47, nays 0
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 55: yeas 93, nays 1
- Senate sponsors: Senators Leising and Crider
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Cherry
- Coauthored by Representatives Thompson, Austin, Lehe
- First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2022: Roll Call 214
- Yeas: 47
January 24, 2022: Roll Call 55
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1