+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Pierce added as coauthor
- Senate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 62, nays 29
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Miller added as coauthor
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
- Authored by Representative Aylesworth