+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 17
- Signed by the Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Merritt added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Leising added as cosponsor
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Becker added as cosponsor
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Bacon, Baird, Bartels, Beumer, Borders, Burton, Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Culver, Davisson, DeVon, Eberhart, Engleman, Friend, Frizzell, Frye, Hamm, Heaton, Heine, Huston, Judy, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lyness , Mahan, May, McNamara, Miller, Morris, Negele, Ober, Olthoff, Pressel, Richardson, Saunders, Siegrist, Slager, Steuerwald, Smith, M., Soliday, Speedy, Sullivan, Thompson, Torr, VanNatter, Washburne, Wesco, Wolkins, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Referred to the Senate
- Representatives Jordan and Mayfield added as coauthors
- Representatives Bartlett, Bauer, Brown, C., Hamilton, Klinker, Lawson, Pryor, Smith, V. added as coauthors
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Bosma added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Head
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 96, nays 0
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Schaibley, Karickhoff, Porter added as coauthors
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Authored by Representative Gutwein
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor