+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 293
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 617: yeas 37, nays 12
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 648: yeas 59, nays 36
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Torr removed as author
- Representative Huston added as author
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph Lonnie M removed as conferee
- Senator Lanane added as conferee
- Senators Doriot and Stoops removed as advisors
- Senators Mishler, Melton, Ford Jon and Leising added as advisors
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Huston and Austin
- House advisors appointed: Lehman, Smaltz, Bartels, Baird, DeLaney, Harris, Hatfield, Jackson, Pfaff, Porter, Pryor, Candelaria Reardon and Moed
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Messmer and Randolph Lonnie M
- Senate advisors appointed: Doriot and Stoops
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 421: yeas 44, nays 4
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot added as third sponsor
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 76, nays 8
- Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Tallian
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Representative DeLaney added as coauthor
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Torr
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary