+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to committee on
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Senator Merritt added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (McMillin) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Pelath added as coauthor
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Frizzell added as coauthor
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Representative Olthoff added as coauthor
- Authored by Representative McMillin