+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Mishler and Tallian
- Senate conferees appointed: Eckerty and Niezgodski
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Clere, Braun, Austin and Taylor J
- House conferees appointed: Huston and Porter
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 324: yeas 49, nays 0
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Amendment #1 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as cosponsor
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Eckerty and Mishler
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 95, nays 1
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Porter added as coauthor
- Amendment #3 (Austin) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Coauthored by Representatives Clere and Braun
- Authored by Representative Huston