+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Public Law 168
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 418: yeas 46 and nays 0
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 485: yeas 84 and nays 12
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Steele added as conferee
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Pierce added as conferee
- Representative McMillin added as advisor
- Representative Thompson added as advisor
- Representative Lawson added as advisor
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Hume added as advisor
- Senator Tallian added as conferee
- Senator M. Young added as advisor
- Senator Taylor added as advisor
- Senator Head added as advisor
- Senator Kenley added as advisor
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Steuerwald added as conferee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 345: yeas 45 and nays 2
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
- HB 1006 Amendment #8 (Bray), prevailed.
- HB 1006 Amendment #1 (Glick), prevailed.
- HB 1006 Amendment #2 (Steele), prevailed.
- HB 1006 Amendment #5 (Head), prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 25, nays 21.
- HB 1006 Amendment #3 (Tomes), prevailed.
- HB 1006 Amendment #7 (Taylor), failed.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Appropriations
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Senator Steele added as sponsor.
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 90 and nays 4
- Referred to the Senate
- Senator M. Young added as second sponsor.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass amend, adopted.
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representatives McMillin, Pierce, Lawson L
- First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Steuerwald.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor