+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Public Law 94
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 394: yeas 47, nays 2
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 390: yeas 93, nays 0
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
- Representative Baird removed as coauthor
- Representative DeVon added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Representative Vermilion A removed as coauthor
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
- Representative Kirchhofer removed as author
- Representative Engleman added as author
- Representative Engleman removed as coauthor
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- House conferees appointed: Engleman and Wright
- House advisors appointed: Schaibley, Bartlett and Hatfield
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Stoops
- Senate advisors appointed: Crider and Randolph Lonnie M
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 272: yeas 39, nays 11
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Senator Crider added as second sponsor
- Amendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Representatives Bosma, Huston, Bacon, Brown, T., Cherry, Aylesworth, Abbott D, Baird, Barrett, Bartlett, Bauer, Campbell, Candelaria Reardon, Clere, Cook, Deal, Engleman, Errington, Frye, Karickhoff, Leonard, Manning, McNamara, Negele, Schaibley, Shackleford, Smith, V., Soliday, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 84, nays 14
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment #9 (Austin) motion withdrawn
- Amendment #8 (Austin) failed; Roll Call 28: yeas 40, nays 57
- Amendment #10 (Kirchhofer) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Prescott) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Authored by Representative Kirchhofer