+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (72)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Law 202
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 493: yeas 92 and nays 8
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 432: yeas 40 and nays 8
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as advisor
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Representative V. Smith added as advisor
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
- Representative Behning added as conferee
- Representative Thompson added as advisor
- Representative Sullivan added as advisor
- Representative VanDenburgh added as conferee
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Pete Miller added as conferee
- Senator Rogers added as conferee
- Senator Kenley added as advisor
- Senator Broden added as advisor
- Senator Kruse added as advisor
- Senator Yoder added as advisor
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 251: yeas 44 and nays 5
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- HB 1004 Amendment #2 (Broden), failed.
- HB 1004 Amendment #1 (Broden), prevailed.
- HB 1004 Amendment #3 (Broden), failed.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added third sponsor.
- Senator Kruse added second sponsor.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Senator Pete Miller added as sponsor.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 87 and nays 9
- Referred to the Senate
- Representative Forestal added as coauthor.
- Representative VanDenburgh added as coauthor.
- Representative Ubelhor added as coauthor.
- Representative Clere added as coauthor.
- Representative Lawson added as coauthor.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Kirchhofer added as coauthor.
- Representative Friend added as coauthor.
- Representative DeVon added as coauthor.
- Representative Soliday added as coauthor.
- Representative Rhoads added as coauthor.
- Representative Kubacki added as coauthor.
- Representative Carbaugh added as coauthor.
- Representative Burton added as coauthor.
- Representative Hamm added as coauthor.
- Representative Richardson added as coauthor.
- Representative Price added as coauthor.
- Representative Negele added as coauthor.
- Representative Moed added as coauthor.
- Representative Frye added as coauthor.
- Representative Ziemke added as coauthor.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment #13 (Smith, V.), prevailed.
- Amendment #14 (Battles), failed; Roll Call 10: yeas 28 and nays 63
- Amendment #11 (Battles), prevailed; Roll Call 9: yeas 91 and nays 0
- Amendment #4 (Smith, V.), failed; Roll Call 5: yeas 29 and nays 64
- Amendment #16 (Errington), failed.
- Amendment #15 (Porter), withdrawn.
- Amendment #7 (Errington), failed.
- Amendment #12 (Smith, V.), prevailed.
- Amendment #9 (Battles), failed.
- Amendment #6 (Errington), failed.
- Amendment #5 (Battles), failed.
- Amendment #1 (Behning), prevailed.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #8 (DeLaney), failed.
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass amend, adopted.
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Bosma added as coauthor
- First Reading: Referred to Education
- Authored by Representative Behning
+ − Amendments (21)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor