+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 45
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 305: yeas 94, nays 2
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 46, nays 3
- Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Pol) failed; Roll Call 212: yeas 10, nays 36
- Amendment #4 (Pol) failed; voice vote
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 7: yeas 90, nays 3
- Senate sponsors: Senators Koch and Freeman
- Rule 105.2 suspended
- Representatives Pressel and Cherry added as coauthors
- Representatives Lehman, May, Negele, Heaton, Teshka J, Speedy, Schaibley, Clere, Ziemke, Gutwein, Abbott D, Miller, O'Brien T, Leonard, Cook, Karickhoff, Young J, Rowray E, Manning, Lindauer, Snow C, Goodrich, Mayfield, Judy, Bartels, VanNatter, Heine, Saunders, Gore M added as coauthors
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Frye R
- Coauthored by Representatives McNamara and Steuerwald
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
+ − Adopted Amendments (11)
+ − Proposed Amendments (10)
+ − Votes (2)
January 11, 2022: Roll Call 7
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 3
January 11, 2022: Roll Call 228
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor