+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Public Law 218
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
- Signed by the Governor
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 539: yeas 37, nays 12
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian removed as conferee
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Forestal removed as conferee
- Representative Sullivan added as conferee
- Representative Sullivan removed as advisor
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Kenley removed as advisor
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 560: yeas 69, nays 29
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Kenley added as conferee
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Brown T, Sullivan, Huston, Frye R, Goodin, Moseley, Porter and Pryor
- House conferees appointed: Soliday and Forestal
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Tallian
- Senate advisors appointed: Kenley, Hershman, Bassler and Stoops
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot added as cosponsor
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
- Senator Hershman added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 360: yeas 34, nays 13
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Amendment #5 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 335: yeas 9, nays 38
- Amendment #8 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Crider and Kenley
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 61, nays 36
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment #13 (Forestal) failed; Roll Call 119: yeas 30, nays 64
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Lehman) prevailed; Roll Call 117: yeas 91, nays 0
- Amendment #1 (Brown T) prevailed; Roll Call 118: yeas 71, nays 21
- Amendment #8 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 120: yeas 29, nays 61
- Amendment #9 (Bartlett) ruled out of order
- Amendment #10 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 122: yeas 30, nays 61
- Amendment #12 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 123: yeas 30, nays 60
- Amendment #3 (Pierce) prevailed; Roll Call 124: yeas 88, nays 0
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Braun added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Frye added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
- Coauthored by Representatives Brown T, Steuerwald and Sullivan
- Authored by Representative Soliday