+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2021
- Be Adopted State Government; 009-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary