+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On August 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ST)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor