+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2012
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
On May 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Executive
- Re-referred to Assignments
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor