+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 23, 2010
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary