+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 18, 2010
- Be Adopted Labor; 009-000-000
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary