+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 22, 2006
- Be Adopted State Government; 005-000-000
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Filed with Secretary