+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 053-000-001
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 10, 2009
- Be Adopted Pensions and Investments; 010-000-000
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary