+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 3, 2015
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary