+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 057-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2007
- Be Adopted as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Changes the Task Force's reporting deadline from January 1, 2008 to December 31, 2008.
+ − Vote
March 21, 2007: SR0052 - Motion To Adopt - Wednesday, March 21, 2007
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor