+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 5, 2008
- Be Adopted as Amended Education; 010-000-000
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On January 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the heading. Urges the State Board of Education to make a formal request to the U.S. Department of Education that the results from the Illinois Standards Achievement Test and Prairie State Achievement Examination scores for those students with limited proficiency in English who would otherwise have been eligible to take the Illinois Measure of Annual Growth in English (IMAGE) Test in 2008 and 2009 not be used to calculate Annual Yearly Progress for the next 2 years.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor