+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2019
- Be Adopted State Government; 005-000-000
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Vote
May 29, 2019: SR0432 - State Government
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor