+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On July 17, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 100-000-000
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 008-000-000
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Aging Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 051-000-000
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 15, 2007
- Be Adopted as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces the introduced resolution. Urges the Department of Public Health to immediately comply with the Alzheimer's Disease Assistance Act in activating the Alzheimer's Disease Advisory Committee and ensuring that it fulfills the requirement of reviewing all State programs and services provided by State agencies directed toward persons with Alzheimer's disease and related dementias and recommending changes to improve the State's response to this serious health problem.