+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On November 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
- Arrived in House
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On December 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Vote
April 8, 2022: SJR0038 - Motion To Adopt
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor