+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 103-000-000
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 058-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2017
- Be Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2017: SJR0037
May 31, 2017: SJR0037 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
May 25, 2017: SJR0037 - Motion To Adopt
May 23, 2017: SJR0037 - Transportation
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor