+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 109-008-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 2, 2013
- Be Adopted Education; 013-000-000
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: SJR0032 - Friday, May 31, 2013
May 14, 2013: SJR0032 - Motion To Adopt - Tuesday, May 14, 2013
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor