+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Referred to Rules Committee
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary