+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 23, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 018-000-000
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 28, 2003
- Be Adopted Transportation; 009-000-000
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Filed with Secretary