+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Garrett
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-001
On August 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On August 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On July 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions July 26, 2007
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-001-003
- Waive Posting Notice
On July 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On July 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Urges British Petroleum to review and reconsider the wastewater treatment facilities proposed to serve the expansion and reconfiguration of its Whiting, Indiana refinery with the specific intent to supplement or enhance treatment efficiencies to eliminate or reduce projected increases in ammonia nitrogen and total suspended solids discharged into Lake Michigan. Makes other changes.