+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary