+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 104-000-000
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 011-000-000
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2007
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
June 20, 2007: SJR0028 - Wednesday, June 20, 2007
March 21, 2007: SJR0028 - Motion To Adopt - Wednesday, March 21, 2007
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor