+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 114-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
On October 22, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 054-000-000
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary