+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 030-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Energy & Environment Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
- Arrived in House
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 19, 2019
- Be Adopted Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Conservation
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary