+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 104-000-000
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 058-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2007
- Be Adopted as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything. Reconstitutes the Joint Task Force on Deaf and Hard of Hearing Education Options created under House Joint Resolution 43 of the 94th General Assembly. Requires the Joint Task Force to submit a report to the General Assembly no later than December 31, 2008.