+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 30, 2017
- Be Adopted Government Reform; 009-000-000
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Government Reform
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: SR0241 - Government Reform
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor