+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2021
- Be Adopted Education; 014-000-000
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Vote
May 25, 2021: SR0232 - Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor