+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 014-000-000
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 052-000-000
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 12, 2013
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2014: SJR0023 - Tuesday, March 04, 2014
April 23, 2013: SJR0023 - Motion To Adopt - Tuesday, April 23, 2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor